Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Bolen, Troy D, against Tellez, Ramiro C, represented by Schumacher, Thomas M., in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Stith, David presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 26, 2013 |
CategoryConsumer/Commercial/Debt |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 27, 2015 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution | |
April 24, 2015 | Docket Event | Dismissal Docket | |
April 30, 2014 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing (OCA) M 4 P.O. TO QUASH DEPO |
|
April 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
Response Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Protective Order to Quash Deposition and Defendant's Motion to Compel and Motion to Continue Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment Due to Failure to Present Witness for Deposition |
|
April 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
Cover Letter Regarding attached proposed order **e-filed** |
|
April 21, 2014 | Docket Event | Motion for Protective Order to Quash Deposition, or in the Alternative, to Modify Time, Place and Manner of Deposition **e-filed** | |
April 11, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing / Setting | |
February 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
Cover Letter notice of hearing attached (unsigned) |
|
October 18, 2013 | Docket Event |
Motion Plaintiff's No-Evidence Motion for Summary Judgment Regarding Defendant's Counterclaim/order attached |
|
July 25, 2013 | Docket Event |
Certificate Of Unfiled Discovery Requests |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.