Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Alvarado, Gabriel, Jr., Alvarado, Victoria, Alvarado, Piedad, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Turner, Ronnie, Jr., Chapa, Jacqueline A. Del Llano, against Morgan, Sandra, represented by Sargent-Fambles, Andrea, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Medary, Missy presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 28, 2013 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice Judgment Notice |
|
June 06, 2017 | Docket Event | Order Granting Nonsuit With Prejudice as to Defendant | |
June 05, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Order Granting Non Suit With Prejudice As To Defendant |
|
June 05, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice Of Nonsuit With Prejudice | |
May 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice Judgment Notice |
|
April 19, 2017 | Docket Event |
Judgment - Agreed Judgment Final Judgment |
|
April 19, 2017 | Docket Event |
Reports Report of Ad Litem |
|
April 19, 2017 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing (OCA) Plaintiff's Motion to Enforce Settlement and for Court Order Minor Settlment Hearing |
|
March 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
Motion for Enforcement Plaintiff's Motion to Enforce Settlement and For Court Ordered Minor Settlement Hearing |
|
March 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Order on Plaintiff's Motion to Enforce Settlement and for Court Ordered monor Settlement Hearing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.