Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Garza, Andrea C, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Anderson, David M, against Ferguson, Kevin, Integrity Adjusting Services, Inc., Ranchers & Farmers Mutual Insurance Company, American Bankers Insurance Exchange, represented by Robbins, April F, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Longoria, Jose presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 25, 2013 |
CategoryContract - Other |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 23, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal With Prejudice /I |
|
January 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss Motion for Dismissal with Prejudice/E-filed |
|
July 17, 2013 | Docket Event |
Rule 11 Agreement **e-filed** |
|
July 17, 2013 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing (OCA) DEF MTN TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND FOR STAY |
|
July 16, 2013 | Docket Event |
Response Plaintiff's Response to Defendant Ranchers and Farmers Mutual Insurance Company's Motion to Compel Arbitration and for Stay **e-filed** |
|
July 02, 2013 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing / Setting | |
June 11, 2013 | Docket Event |
Motion Subject to A Motion to Compel, Arbitration and for Stay, and Plea in Abatement, Defendants Original Answer/e-filed |
|
May 01, 2013 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Service |
|
April 01, 2013 | Docket Event |
Certificate Secretary Of State |
|
March 20, 2013 | Docket Event |
Plea in Abatement Defendants Ranchers & Farmers Mutual Insurance Company/E-filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.