Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Flores, Adrian, filed a(n) Civil Case - Other case represented by Bourlon, Bobby Lee, Sr., against Soliz-Cantu, Amanda, Solis, Leanna, represented by Burkett, Nathan, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Hasette, Nanette presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 25, 2013 |
CategoryCivil Case - Other |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail Notice of Setting |
|
April 09, 2014 | Docket Event | Final Hearing | |
April 09, 2014 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution | |
March 28, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order Notice of Setting |
|
March 21, 2014 | Docket Event | Dismissal Docket | |
February 25, 2014 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail In Re: set a hearing |
|
May 21, 2013 | Docket Event |
Letter Re: Service Requested 02/25/2013 (no longer necessary) |
|
May 20, 2013 | Docket Event |
Motion to Transfer/Change of Venue Defendant Leanna Soliz' Motion to Transfer Venue |
|
May 20, 2013 | Docket Event |
Original Answer Subject to her motion to transfer Venue, Defendant Leanna Soliz' Original Answer |
|
April 01, 2013 | Docket Event | Citation |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.