Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Hernandez, Mary G., filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Hernandez, Juan G., in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Williams, Guy presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 27, 2013 |
CategoryDivorce - No Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 31, 2013 | Docket Event |
Final Hearing DIVORCE |
|
May 31, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order Final Decree of Divorce/I |
|
May 10, 2013 | Docket Event | Notice of Nonsuit | |
April 12, 2013 | Docket Event |
Original Answer Written Answer |
|
April 01, 2013 | Docket Event | Citation | |
March 27, 2013 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Indigency | |
March 27, 2013 | Docket Event |
Service Request Information Sheet Service Requested |
|
March 27, 2013 | Docket Event | Family Case Information Sheet | |
March 27, 2013 | Docket Event | BVS Acceptance Form | |
March 27, 2013 | Docket Event |
Original Petition (OCA) Original Petition for Divorce |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.