Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Garcia, Joanna, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Garcia, Eric, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Williams, Guy presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 22, 2013 |
CategoryDivorce - Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 27, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of Address Change | |
May 05, 2014 | Docket Event | Z - Notice of Change of Payee (AG) | |
November 13, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order Final Decree of Divorce (I) |
|
November 13, 2013 | Docket Event | Entry of Judgment | |
August 23, 2013 | Docket Event |
Final Hearing DIVORCE |
|
August 09, 2013 | Docket Event |
Settlement Agreement Mediated Settlement Agreement |
|
July 01, 2013 | Docket Event | Temporary Orders | |
May 07, 2013 | Docket Event |
Subpoena Issued to Ms. Michelle Ortiz on 05/06/13, Served on 05/06/13 by a Private Process Server |
|
May 07, 2013 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing (OCA) TO COMPEL AND FOR POSSESSION |
|
April 17, 2013 | Docket Event |
Original Answer Respondent's Original Answer |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.