Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Chesnut, Margo E, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Chesnut, John Kent, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Longoria, Jose presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 22, 2013 |
CategoryDivorce - Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Forms Mailed to Austin BVS for Order Signed 02/10/2016 |
|
February 29, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice and Final Decree of Divorce Mailed | |
February 10, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order Final Decree of Divorce |
|
November 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
Letter DWQ Cancellation Letter to EOG Resources, Inc. (Custodian of Records) |
|
October 02, 2015 | Docket Event |
Subpoena Issued to Robert Reed served on 10/01/2015 by TCP |
|
October 02, 2015 | Docket Event | Final Hearing | |
August 12, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing / Setting Notice of Hearing |
|
July 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
Request Docket Control Conference |
|
June 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
Deposition Subpoena Subpoena issued to Don Peters or the Custodian of Records for EOG Resources Inc., on 06/09/15, Served on 06/09/15 |
|
May 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Subpoena Issued to Don Peters or the Custodian of Records for EOG Resourcs, Inc. on 05/05/15, Served on 05/05/15 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.