Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Garza, Adan M., filed a(n) Other Parent-Child - Family case against Nolan, Jeni Lee Rachel, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Stith, David presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 21, 2013 |
CategoryParent/Child Relationship |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeOther Parent-Child |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
Z - Certificate of Termination of Assignment (AG) Notice of Termination of Assignment and Child Support Services |
|
March 08, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice | |
March 08, 2018 | Docket Event | Entry of Judgment | |
March 08, 2018 | Docket Event | Order In Suit To Modify Parent-Child Relationship | |
March 02, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing / Setting | |
February 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Order in Suit to Modify Parent-Child Relationship |
|
February 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Motion to Sign Order in Suit to Modify Parent-Child Relationship | |
February 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Final Hearing (2HRS) |
|
February 09, 2018 | Docket Event | Z - Intervention (AG) | |
January 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing / Setting Hearing Confirmation |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.