Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Walton, Michael D, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Walton, Cindy Dungan, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Williams, Guy presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 20, 2013 |
CategoryDivorce - No Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 02, 2013 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal (Imaged) | |
November 26, 2013 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) DIVORCE TRIAL/DISMISSAL |
|
October 28, 2013 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) DIVORCE TRIAL/DISMISSAL |
|
March 25, 2013 | Docket Event | Family Case Information Sheet | |
March 20, 2013 | Docket Event |
Original Petition (OCA) Original Petition for Divorce |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.