Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Bray, Maureen E., filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Bray, Ian M., in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Watts, Sandra L. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 18, 2013 |
CategoryDivorce - Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
Employer's Order of Withholding - Request 2/7/2019 Mailed EOW order signed 8/7/2013 to Doggett Heavy Machinery attn: Tiffany Fuller/Payroll, 9lll North FWY, Houston, TX 77037 |
|
June 30, 2017 | Docket Event |
Employer's Order of Withholding - Request 7/3/2017 Mailed EOW order signed 8/7/2013 to Nueces Power Equipment, 7510 IH 37 Access, Corpus Christi, TX 78409 |
|
September 09, 2013 | Docket Event |
Employer's Order of Withholding - Request 9/10/2013 Mailed EOW order signed 8/7/2013 to Schlumberger Tech Corp. , 3600 Briar Park Dr., 3rd Floor MD2, Houston, TX 77042//Connie Stahler |
|
August 07, 2013 | Docket Event |
Employer's Order of Withholding - Request 08/09/2013 Mailed EOW Order signed 08/07/13 to ORION ICS, LLC, 400 Regency Forrest Dr., Suite 310, Cary, NC 27518 |
|
August 07, 2013 | Docket Event | Final Hearing Divorce (set by the Court) -- Attorney Arnold Gonzalez, Jr. / Mr. Bray, Pro Se | |
August 07, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order - Employer's Order of Withholding Imaged |
|
August 07, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order I/Final Decree of Divorce |
|
August 05, 2013 | Docket Event | Final Hearing Divorce (set by the Court) -- Attorney Arrnold Gonzalez, Jr. / (Mr. Bray) Pro Se | |
July 31, 2013 | Docket Event | Certificate of Completion of Impact of Divorce on Children Seminar **e-filed** | |
May 07, 2013 | Docket Event | Certificate of Completion/E-filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.