Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Constante, Chris, Constante, Chriss, filed a(n) Other Parent-Child - Family case against Davidson, Esther S., Davidson, Esther Sue, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Watts, Sandra L. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 26, 2013 |
CategoryParent/Child Relationship |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeOther Parent-Child |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order I/ Order Adudicating Parentage and Order in Suit to Modify the Parent-Child Relationship |
|
February 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
Z - Letter From IV-D Court Regarding Court Hearing 2/27 @ 8 |
|
January 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
Z - Request for Service NCP SVC RETURN |
|
January 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
Z - Letter From IV-D Court Regarding Court Hearing 2/17 @ 1 |
|
January 13, 2015 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Order Granting Respondent's Motion for Continuance |
|
January 13, 2015 | Docket Event |
Motion for Continuance Respondent's Motion for Continuance |
|
December 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
BVS Acceptance Form completed/scanned |
|
November 17, 2014 | Docket Event | Citation | |
November 12, 2014 | Docket Event | Z - Order (AG) | |
October 30, 2014 | Docket Event |
Z - Proposed Order (AG) ORDER SETTING HEARING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.