Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Schwartz, Scott, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Schwartz, Elizabeth, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Williams, Guy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilliams, Guy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2013 |
CategoryDivorce - Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 01, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order Final Decree of Divorce (I) |
|
February 26, 2014 | Docket Event | Temporary Orders (Imaged) | |
February 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
Entry of Judgment TEMPORARY ORDER |
|
February 04, 2014 | Docket Event | Temporary Orders | |
January 29, 2014 | Docket Event |
Original Answer Respondent's |
|
January 09, 2014 | Docket Event | Citation | |
January 09, 2014 | Docket Event | Show Cause | |
January 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing / Setting I/Notice of Hearing 2/4 @ 8:30 PM |
|
December 30, 2013 | Docket Event |
Original Petition (OCA) Original Petition for Divorce |
|
December 30, 2013 | Docket Event |
Service Request Information Sheet service requested |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.