Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Shine, Maria Christene, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Johnson, Matthew, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Hasette, Nanette presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHasette, Nanette Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 20, 2013 |
CategoryProtective Order |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
Motion for Nonsuit **walk to court** |
|
January 24, 2014 | Docket Event | Affidavit In Support Of Motion For Non-Suit **walk to court** | |
January 24, 2014 | Docket Event | Order Granting Non-Suit /I | |
January 23, 2014 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) Application for Protective Order; Respondent in Custody |
|
January 13, 2014 | Docket Event | Texas Crime Information Center | |
January 07, 2014 | Docket Event | Order Extending Ex Parte Protective Order-1/23/14 @ 1:30PM | |
January 06, 2014 | Docket Event |
Motion to Extend Temporary Ex Parte Protective Order/order attached, walked to court |
|
January 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) PROTECTIVE ORDER |
|
December 23, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order - Ex-Parte Order I/Temporary Ex Parte Protective Order & Order Setting Hearing 1/3 @ 1:30 PM |
|
December 23, 2013 | Docket Event | Application for Protective Order (Notice) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.