Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Educap, Inc., filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Jenkins, Jody D., against Perez, Lupita E., Botello, Alexandrea N., in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Longoria, Jose presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLongoria, Jose Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2012 |
CategoryConsumer/Commercial/Debt |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 25, 2014 | Docket Event |
Judgment - Default Judgment (Imaged) |
|
March 25, 2014 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) DEFAULT HEARING |
|
March 20, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice of Oral Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment **e-filed** | |
March 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
Motion Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment **e-filed** |
|
March 07, 2014 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Service-Julie Gregory #5557 |
|
July 22, 2013 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Substituted Service - April McDaniel SCH #8109 served Alexandra Botello 06/11/2013. |
|
June 24, 2013 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Substituted Service- April McDaniel (EZ Messenger) [Alexandrea N. Botello served on 06/11/2013] |
|
June 03, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order For Substituted Service (I) |
|
May 28, 2013 | Docket Event |
Motion on Rule 106 Motion for Rule 106 Service |
|
May 28, 2013 | Docket Event |
Affidavit In Support of a Substituted Service Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.