Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Perez, Johnny, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Morowski, Peter D, against Republic Services, Inc., Bfi Waste Services Of Texas, L.P., Moore, Caesar, Republic Waste Services Of Texas Gp, Inc., Republic Waste Services Of Texas, Ltd, (total of 5) See All represented by Warren, Larry D., in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Medary, Missy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMedary, Missy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 18, 2012 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice Judgment Notice |
|
May 26, 2016 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution | |
April 29, 2016 | Docket Event | Dismissal Docket | |
March 28, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice DWOP Notice Sent |
|
August 12, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal by Plaintiff/Nonsuit/Non-Final Order of Dismissal (BFI Waste Services of Texas, L.P & Cesar Moore Only/Imaged |
|
August 05, 2014 | Docket Event |
Motion Plaintiff's Motion To Dismiss With Prejudice **e-filed** |
|
April 23, 2014 | Docket Event |
Certificate Reporter's Certification Oral and Videotaped Deposition of Johnny Perez, Jr. |
|
May 01, 2013 | Docket Event |
Designation Plaintiff's Designation of Attorney in Charge/E-filed |
|
April 29, 2013 | Docket Event |
Original Answer Defendants, BFI Waste Services of Texas, L.P. and Ceasar Moore's Original Answer to Plaintiff's Third Amended Petition |
|
April 24, 2013 | Docket Event | Citation |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.