Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Middleton, Kathy, Middleton, Jeff, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Perkins, Eric D., against Pena, Nicolas, Pena, Michelle, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Pulcher, Jack W. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePulcher, Jack W. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 14, 2012 |
CategoryContract - Other |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 13, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice Judgment Notice |
|
August 12, 2015 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution | |
July 22, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice of Setting for Dismissal -- August 12, 2015 @ 1:30PM | |
April 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
Status Hearing (OCA) STATUS HEARING/.ENTRY OF JUDGMENT |
|
February 19, 2015 | Docket Event |
Final Hearing STATUS/ENTRY OF ORDER |
|
December 18, 2014 | Docket Event | Order Setting Hearing -- Status/Entry of Order Set for February 19, 2015 @ 8:30AM | |
November 20, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice of Setting for Dismissal -- December 17, 2014 @ 8:30AM | |
February 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) STATUS |
|
December 18, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order setting status hearing: 02/19/14 at 1:30pm |
|
September 27, 2013 | Docket Event | Notice of Setting for Dismissal -- October 24, 2013 @ 8:30AM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.