Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Nueces County, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case against Coleman, Randolph, Nicholson, L.P., Prosperity Bank, Sanchez, Francisca, Sanchez, Ramon, (total of 6) See All represented by Villarreal-Kuchta, Michele, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Rogoff-Klein, Inna presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 25, 2012 |
CategoryTax Cases |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
Orders of Sale NPDC |
|
January 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order of Sale NPDC |
|
December 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice Judgment Notice for Court Cost Mailed out 12/10/2019 (NCP) DEF: Ramon Sanchez and Prosperity Bank |
|
November 18, 2019 | Docket Event | Order Approving Fee For Attorney AD Litem (Signed) | |
November 18, 2019 | Docket Event | Final Hearing | |
November 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
Judgment - Default Judgment Judgment (Signed) |
|
November 18, 2019 | Docket Event | Statement of Evidence (Signed) | |
November 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice 2 | |
November 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
Reports Report of AD Litem for Defendants Cited by Posting |
|
November 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Statement of Evidence |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.