Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Nueces County, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case against The United States Of America, Rogers, Jackie, Rogers, Graford E., represented by Warren, John S., in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Hernandez, Angelica presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 25, 2012 |
CategoryTax Cases |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 22, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order judgment |
|
August 22, 2014 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) STATUS HEARING |
|
July 28, 2014 | Docket Event |
Attorney Correspondence Re: final hearing @ 8:30 a.m. @ Jackie Rogers 6041 Lemans Drive Corpus Christi TX. 78414 ***e-filed*** |
|
July 28, 2014 | Docket Event |
Attorney Correspondence Re: final hearing @ 8:30 a.m. @ Graford E. Rogers 6041 Lemans Drive Corpus Christi TX. 78414 ***e-filed*** |
|
September 05, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order on Motion to Withdraw-granted |
|
September 04, 2013 | Docket Event |
Motion to Withdraw **Walked To Court** |
|
July 05, 2013 | Docket Event |
Citation NPDC |
|
July 02, 2013 | Docket Event |
Amended Petition : First |
|
November 21, 2012 | Docket Event | Original Answer | |
October 01, 2012 | Docket Event |
Citation NPDC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.