Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Nueces County, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case against Cruz, Victor Rolando, represented by Stork, E. Tres, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Galvan, Bobby presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 25, 2012 |
CategoryTax Cases |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 09, 2015 | Docket Event | Release of Judgment | |
November 09, 2015 | Docket Event | Cover Letter for Release of Judgment | |
September 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order of Sale NPDC |
|
September 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
Orders of Sale NPDC |
|
July 31, 2015 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail Notice Of Judgment and/or Dismissal |
|
July 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Judgment |
|
July 23, 2015 | Docket Event | Judgment - Agreed Judgment | |
July 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice Statement of Evidence |
|
July 23, 2015 | Docket Event | Final Hearing | |
July 17, 2015 | Docket Event | Exhibit 1 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.