Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Nueces County, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case against Lehman Farms Llc, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Stith, David presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 25, 2012 |
CategoryTax Cases |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 05, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice of Judgment and/or Dismissal | |
May 22, 2015 | Docket Event | Dismissal Docket | |
May 18, 2015 | Docket Event | Order for Non-Suit | |
May 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
Motion for Nonsuit Motion For Non-Suit |
|
May 07, 2015 | Docket Event | Cover Letter For Non-Suit | |
May 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Order For Non-Suit |
|
December 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice Citation Served Lehman Farms |
|
November 04, 2014 | Docket Event |
Citation NPDC |
|
October 22, 2013 | Docket Event |
Citation NPDC |
|
October 14, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order on Substitution of Citation |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.