Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Chubbs, Flo, filed a(n) Civil Case - Other case represented by Whittle, William, against Moses, Curt, Munoz, Cesar, Rich, Ruth, Stephens, Timothy, Schwind, Ann Marie, (total of 7) See All represented by Morris, Myra K, Thorpe, Robert D, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Medary, Missy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMedary, Missy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 31, 2012 |
CategoryCivil Case - Other |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice Justice Court Civil Case Information Sheet |
|
July 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion Petitioner's Motion to Set Hearing |
|
July 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Notice of Hearing |
|
June 10, 2016 | Docket Event | Settlement Agreement and Mutual Release | |
June 10, 2016 | Docket Event | Civil Case Information Sheet | |
March 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice Judgment Notice |
|
March 11, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal by Plaintiff/Nonsuit/Non-Final Agreed Order of Dismissal |
|
February 25, 2015 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Agreed Order of Dismissal With Prejudice |
|
February 25, 2015 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss Agreed Motion to Dismiss All Claims and Counterclaims with Prejudice |
|
February 09, 2015 | Docket Event | Jury Trial |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.