Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Polanco, Dora, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Hoestenbach, Rhett, against Bayfront On Starr, Llc, Hotel Corpus Christi Bayfront, represented by Sparks, Katherine A., in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Williams, Guy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilliams, Guy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 20, 2012 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Other |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 02, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice Judgment Notice (I) |
|
October 28, 2014 | Docket Event | Order Granting the Notice of Dismissal With Prejudice (I) | |
October 07, 2014 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Granting the Notice of Dismissal with Prejudice |
|
October 07, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Dismissal with Prejudice Under Rule 162 |
|
March 12, 2014 | Docket Event |
Letter In Re: Hearing |
|
February 07, 2014 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT |
|
January 06, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing / Setting **e-filed** |
|
January 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
Motion Defendants Bayfront On Starr, LLC, Hotel Corpus Christi Bayfront and Bayfront On Starr, LLC d/b/a Hotel Corpus Christi Bayfront's Motion for No-Evidence Summary Judgment **e-filed** |
|
November 14, 2013 | Docket Event |
Certificate Certification Rule 203 Filing |
|
October 18, 2013 | Docket Event |
Certificate Certification Rule 203 Filing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.