Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Lopez, Oscar, J.G. Wentworth Originations, Llc, filed a(n) Civil Case - Other case represented by Korduba, Laryssa Maria, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Hernandez, Angelica presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHernandez, Angelica Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 19, 2012 |
CategoryCivil Case - Other |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 08, 2013 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) MOTION TO TRANSFER STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT |
|
February 01, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order Final Order Approving Transfer of Structured Settlement Payment Rights |
|
January 24, 2013 | Docket Event | Amended Notice of Hewaring on Application for Approval of a Transfer of Structered Settlement Payment Rights, Notice of Proposed Trasfer of Structered Annuity Payments, and Notice of Deadline for Responses to Application/E-filed | |
January 24, 2013 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) MOTION TO TRANSFER STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT |
|
December 20, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing / Setting Notice of Hearing on Amended Application for Approval of a Transfer of Structured Settlement Payment Rights, Notice of Proposed Transfe of Structured Annuity Payments, and Notice of Deadline for Responses to Application - 01/24/2013 @ 8:30 A.M. **e-filed** |
|
December 19, 2012 | Docket Event |
Original Petition (OCA) Application for Approval of a Transfer of Structured Settlement Payemnt Rights **e-filed** |
|
December 19, 2012 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Information Sheet **e-filed** |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.