Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Luna, Devin Jean, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Luna, Jose Antonio, Jr., in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Williams, Guy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilliams, Guy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 21, 2012 |
CategoryDivorce - No Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 10, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order Final Divorce Decree/I |
|
May 10, 2013 | Docket Event |
Final Hearing DIVORCE |
|
April 24, 2013 | Docket Event | Original Answer | |
April 15, 2013 | Docket Event | Citation | |
April 10, 2013 | Docket Event |
Service Request Information Sheet Service Requested |
|
January 16, 2013 | Docket Event | Citation | |
January 14, 2013 | Docket Event |
Service Request Information Sheet Service Requested |
|
December 21, 2012 | Docket Event | Pro Se Notice | |
December 21, 2012 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Inability to Pay | |
December 21, 2012 | Docket Event |
Original Petition (OCA) Original Petition For Divorce |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.