Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Aguilar, Laura Beth, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Mesa, David, Jr., in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Stith, David presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 26, 2012 |
CategoryDivorce - Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
Z - Letter From Clerk Judgment Notice/AG Case Closed |
|
April 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Z - Order (AG) Order Confirming Support Arrearage |
|
April 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) Mtn to confirm arrears |
|
April 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Z - Officer's Return CP Served |
|
April 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Z - Officer's Return NCP Served |
|
March 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Citation | |
February 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Z - Order (AG) Order Setting Hearing 4/19/18 @8am |
|
February 08, 2018 | Docket Event | Z - Family Case Information Sheet | |
February 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
Z - CNFRM SPT ARREARS (AG) (OCA) Motion to Confirm Support Arrearage |
|
February 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
Z - Proposed Order (AG) Order Setting Hearing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.