Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Cantu, Kristie Pacheco, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Cantu, Anastacio, Iii, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Williams, Guy presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 20, 2012 |
CategoryDivorce - No Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 12, 2014 | Docket Event |
Envelope Returned Undelivered Notice of Setting |
|
December 19, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order Final Divorce Decree (I) |
|
December 19, 2013 | Docket Event |
Final Hearing DIVORCE |
|
November 07, 2013 | Docket Event |
Citation Posting for Seven Days |
|
November 01, 2013 | Docket Event |
Service Request Information Sheet Service Requested |
|
September 20, 2012 | Docket Event |
Service Request Information Sheet No Service Requested |
|
September 20, 2012 | Docket Event |
Original Petition (OCA) Original Petition for Divorce |
|
September 20, 2012 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Inability to Pay Court Costs | |
September 20, 2012 | Docket Event | Family Case Information Sheet | |
September 20, 2012 | Docket Event | BVS Acceptance Form |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.