Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Adams, Larry J filed a(n) Other Parent-Child - Family case in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Medary, Missy presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 20, 2012 |
CategoryParent/Child Relationship |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeOther Parent-Child |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 23, 2017 | Docket Event |
Z - Letter From Clerk Judgment Notice /AG case closed |
|
October 12, 2016 | Docket Event |
Z - Order (AG) Order in Suit for Modification of Support Order and to Confirm Support Arrearage |
|
October 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail For CP |
|
September 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
Z - Officer's Return CP Unserved |
|
September 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
Z - Letter From IV-D Court Regarding court hearing on 10/11/16 @ 1 |
|
September 15, 2016 | Docket Event | Motion For Continuance | |
September 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Cover Letter | |
September 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
Original Answer Respondent's Original Answer |
|
August 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
Z - Officer's Return NCP Unserved |
|
July 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
Citation NPDC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.