Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Mora, Veronica, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Garcia, Cristobal Ramon, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Hasette, Nanette presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHasette, Nanette Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 31, 2012 |
CategoryDivorce - Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
Z - Letter From Clerk Judgment Notice/AG Case Closed |
|
June 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
Z - Order (AG) Child Support Review Order (Confirmation of Arrears and Modification) |
|
May 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
Z - Health Insurance Availability Form (AG) Health Insurance Availability Form-NCP |
|
May 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
Z - Health Insurance Availability Form (AG) Health Insurance Availability Form-CP |
|
May 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
Z - CSRO - Confrmtn of Arrears/Modification/Chg of Sta (AG) Child Support Review Order (Confirmation of Arrears and Modification) |
|
July 18, 2014 | Docket Event | Z - Notice of Change of Payee (AG) | |
July 09, 2014 | Docket Event | Z - Notice of Change of Payee (AG) | |
October 03, 2012 | Docket Event |
Letter from Clerk Notice of Judgment |
|
October 03, 2012 | Docket Event |
Order Final Decree of Divorce |
|
October 03, 2012 | Docket Event | Incomplete BVS Form |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.