Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Bieber, Michael, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Genus, Tiffara Myla, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Longoria, Jose presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLongoria, Jose Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 30, 2012 |
CategoryDivorce - No Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 12, 2012 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) FINAL HEARING |
|
December 12, 2012 | Docket Event |
Order Final Decree of Divorce |
|
November 08, 2012 | Docket Event |
Citation issued with orig only no file |
|
November 07, 2012 | Docket Event |
Order On Motion For Alternative Service (I) |
|
November 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Affidaivt in Support of Motion for Other Substituted Service/walkd to court by atty |
|
November 06, 2012 | Docket Event | Motion for Alternative Service/walkd to court by atty | |
November 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
Service Request Information Sheet Service Requested |
|
July 30, 2012 | Docket Event | Original Petition (OCA) | |
July 30, 2012 | Docket Event | Family Case Information Sheet | |
July 30, 2012 | Docket Event |
Service Request Information Sheet No Service Requested |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.