Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Martinez, Juan, Jr., filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Mosel, Theresa M, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Stith, David presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStith, David Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 24, 2012 |
CategoryDivorce - No Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 07, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution /I |
|
March 07, 2014 | Docket Event | Dismissal Docket | |
May 06, 2013 | Docket Event |
Final Hearing (1HR) |
|
August 03, 2012 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Written Discovery Directed to Respondent |
|
August 03, 2012 | Docket Event |
Original Answer Counter-Respondent's Original Answer to Counter-Petition for Divorce |
|
July 31, 2012 | Docket Event |
Original Answer /Efiled |
|
July 31, 2012 | Docket Event |
Counter Claim / Counter Petition Original Counterpetition for Divorce **e-filed** |
|
July 25, 2012 | Docket Event |
Family Case Information Sheet **e-Filed** |
|
July 25, 2012 | Docket Event |
Service Request Information Sheet No Service **e-Filed** |
|
July 25, 2012 | Docket Event |
BVS Acceptance Form **e-Filed** |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.