Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Guerra, Tracy Anne, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Guerra, Charles Rene, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Medary, Missy presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 27, 2012 |
CategoryDivorce - Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 17, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution Docket Sheet (I) |
|
May 17, 2013 | Docket Event |
Entry of Judgment Dismissal Docket |
|
April 05, 2013 | Docket Event | Final Hearing | |
April 03, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order to Withdraw as Counsel (I) |
|
April 03, 2013 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing (OCA) Motion to Withdraw |
|
March 20, 2013 | Docket Event |
Motion to Withdraw Motion for Withdrawl of Counsel/Walked up to court |
|
December 18, 2012 | Docket Event |
Letter To Court Manager |
|
May 07, 2012 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service | |
May 07, 2012 | Docket Event | Affidavit Of Service | |
April 23, 2012 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.