Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Garcia, Elvira, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Garcia, Abelardo, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Williams, Guy presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 22, 2012 |
CategoryDivorce - Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 12, 2014 | Docket Event |
Letter In Re: notice for extended summer possession |
|
October 03, 2012 | Docket Event |
Order Final Decree of Divorce (I) |
|
October 01, 2012 | Docket Event |
Employer's Order of Withholding - Request 10/03/2012 Mailed Temporary Orders signed 5/9/2012 to H.E.B., P. O. Box 839999, San Antonio, TX 78283-3999 |
|
October 01, 2012 | Docket Event | Letter | |
August 15, 2012 | Docket Event |
Certificate Of Completion |
|
July 31, 2012 | Docket Event |
Final Hearing DIVORCE |
|
May 31, 2012 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) ENTRY OF ORDER |
|
May 31, 2012 | Docket Event | Temporary Order | |
May 18, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Order Hearing |
|
May 09, 2012 | Docket Event | Temporary Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.