Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Ortiz, Ramon, Jr., filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Ortiz, Maria Magdalena, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Watts, Sandra L. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 22, 2012 |
CategoryDivorce - Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 23, 2012 | Docket Event | Final Hearing Divorce (set by the Court) -- Attorney William Thau | |
May 10, 2012 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Completion of Child Parent Education Program |
|
May 10, 2012 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Completion for Child Parent Education Program |
|
May 04, 2012 | Docket Event |
Order - Employer's Order of Withholding Employer's Order to Withhold from Earnings for Child Support (imaged) |
|
May 04, 2012 | Docket Event |
Order Final Decree of Divorce |
|
March 21, 2012 | Docket Event |
Waiver Of Service |
|
February 22, 2012 | Docket Event | Original Petition (OCA) | |
February 22, 2012 | Docket Event | Family Case Information Sheet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.