Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Seidel, Randy, Seidel, Valerie, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Seidel, Randy, Seidel, Valerie, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Greenwell, Thomas F. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 22, 2012 |
CategoryDivorce - Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 10, 2013 | Docket Event |
Letter change of address |
|
July 10, 2013 | Docket Event | Letter from Valerie Seidel | |
November 28, 2012 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing (OCA) ENTRY |
|
November 28, 2012 | Docket Event |
Order Final Decree of Divorce (Scanned) |
|
September 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
Certificate Of Completion |
|
July 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
Agreement Mediated Settlement Agreement |
|
May 14, 2012 | Docket Event |
Original Answer Amicus Attorney's Original Answer In Suit Affecting The Parent-Child Relationship |
|
May 09, 2012 | Docket Event | Motion for Medical Examination | |
May 09, 2012 | Docket Event |
Order of Referral to Medication (Scanned) |
|
May 09, 2012 | Docket Event | Motion For Appointment Of Amicus Attorney **Walked Up** |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.