Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Saratoga Cove, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case against Farley, Ronnie O, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Cox, Larry G. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 22, 2012 |
CategoryEviction |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 01, 2012 | Docket Event |
Judgment for the Plaintiff Hearing result for Eviction Hearing held on 02/29/2012 09:00 AM: Judgment for the Plaintiff for $925.00 plus court costs interest at 5% per annum and possession. ENTRY_DATETIME: 2012-03-01 15:21:10.0000000 ENTRY_USER: JB10048 LAST_DATETIME: 2012-03-01 15:21:10.0000000 LAST_USER: JB10048 |
|
February 29, 2012 | Docket Event | Judgment entered order date: 2/29/2012 Judgment type: Judgment for Plaintiff Disposition type: Judgment for Plaintiff Parties on judgment: Farley, Ronnie O, Defendant; Saratoga Cove, Plaintiff(in favor) ENTRY_DATETIME: 2012-03-01 15:22:13.0000000 ENTRY_USER: JB10048 LAST_DATETIME: 2012-03-01 15:22:13.0000000 LAST_USER: JB10048 | |
February 29, 2012 | Docket Event | Eviction Hearing | |
February 23, 2012 | Docket Event |
Citation Issued Citation returned ENTRY_DATETIME: 2012-02-23 14:25:04.0000000 ENTRY_USER: JB10048 LAST_DATETIME: 2012-02-23 14:25:04.0000000 LAST_USER: JB10048 |
|
February 22, 2012 | Docket Event |
Service Citation: Served Ronnie O Farley Assigned to Service fee $0.00 Served 2/22/2012 ENTRY_DATETIME: 2012-02-23 14:24:50.0000000 ENTRY_USER: JB10048 LAST_DATETIME: 2012-02-23 14:24:50.0000000 LAST_USER: JB10048 |
|
February 22, 2012 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv Filing: JP Filing - Service Fee Constable 2 Paid by: Saratoga Cove (plaintiff) Receipt number: 0017580 Dated: 2/22/2012 Amount: $75.00 (Check) ENTRY_DATETIME: 2012-02-22 11:55:00.0000000 ENTRY_USER: JB10048 LAST_DATETIME: 2012-02-22 11:55:00.0000000 LAST_USER: JB10048 |
|
February 22, 2012 | Docket Event |
Service ENTRY_DATETIME: 2012-02-22 13:08:11.0000000 ENTRY_USER: JB10048 LAST_DATETIME: 2012-02-23 14:24:49.0000000 LAST_USER: JB10048 |
|
February 22, 2012 | Docket Event |
Issued Citation: Issued Ronnie O Farley Assigned to Service fee of $0.00 on 2/22/2012 ENTRY_DATETIME: 2012-02-22 13:08:12.0000000 ENTRY_USER: JB10048 LAST_DATETIME: 2012-02-22 13:08:12.0000000 LAST_USER: JB10048 |
|
February 22, 2012 | Docket Event |
Case Filed (OCA OPEN) Case filed ENTRY_DATETIME: 2012-02-22 11:52:52.0000000 ENTRY_USER: JB10048 LAST_DATETIME: 2012-02-22 11:52:52.0000000 LAST_USER: JB10048 |
|
February 22, 2012 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv Eviction Citation Issued ENTRY_DATETIME: 2012-02-22 13:08:32.0000000 ENTRY_USER: JB10048 LAST_DATETIME: 2012-02-22 13:08:32.0000000 LAST_USER: JB10048 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.