Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Royce, Ellen, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case against Goodenough, John, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Torres, Amanda N. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 28, 2012 |
CategoryEviction |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 07, 2012 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv court grants plaintiff possession of the premises by 4/12/2012, no unpaid back rent or court cost. ENTRY_DATETIME: 2012-03-07 09:53:37.0000000 ENTRY_USER: DR9360 LAST_DATETIME: 2012-03-07 09:53:37.0000000 LAST_USER: DR9360 |
|
March 07, 2012 | Docket Event | Eviction Hearing | |
March 07, 2012 | Docket Event |
Comment Hearing result for Eviction Hearing held on 03/07/2012 09:00 AM: Trial By Judge ENTRY_DATETIME: 2012-03-07 09:53:47.0000000 ENTRY_USER: DR9360 LAST_DATETIME: 2012-03-07 09:53:47.0000000 LAST_USER: DR9360 |
|
February 28, 2012 | Docket Event |
Service ENTRY_DATETIME: 2012-03-07 09:52:36.0000000 ENTRY_USER: DR9360 LAST_DATETIME: 2012-03-07 09:52:37.0000000 LAST_USER: DR9360 |
|
February 28, 2012 | Docket Event | Hearing Scheduled (Eviction Hearing 03/07/2012 09:00 AM) ENTRY_DATETIME: 2012-02-28 15:51:43.0000000 ENTRY_USER: LL9365 LAST_DATETIME: 2012-02-28 15:51:43.0000000 LAST_USER: LL9365 | |
February 28, 2012 | Docket Event |
Issued Citation: Issued John Goodenough Assigned to Constable Service fee of $0.00 on 2/28/2012 ENTRY_DATETIME: 2012-03-07 09:52:37.0000000 ENTRY_USER: DR9360 LAST_DATETIME: 2012-03-07 09:52:37.0000000 LAST_USER: DR9360 |
|
February 28, 2012 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv Filing: Eviction Filing Fee and Service Fee Constable 1 Paid by: Royce, Ellen (plaintiff) Receipt number: 0033845 Dated: 2/28/2012 Amount: $106.00 (Check) ENTRY_DATETIME: 2012-02-28 15:52:24.0000000 ENTRY_USER: LL9365 LAST_DATETIME: 2012-02-28 15:52:24.0000000 LAST_USER: LL9365 |
|
February 28, 2012 | Docket Event |
Case Filed (OCA OPEN) Case filed ENTRY_DATETIME: 2012-02-28 15:48:38.0000000 ENTRY_USER: LL9365 LAST_DATETIME: 2012-02-28 15:48:38.0000000 LAST_USER: LL9365 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.