Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Wildenhaus, Cretoria Gene, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Wildenhaus, Daniel Joseph, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Watts, Sandra L. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWatts, Sandra L. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 17, 2012 |
CategoryDivorce - Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
Z - Notice of Change of Payee (AG) Notice Of Attorney General As Necessary Party And Change Of Payee |
|
February 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
Forms Mailed to Austin BVS Form for Order signed 02/12/2015 |
|
February 12, 2015 | Docket Event | Order in Suit to Modify Parent-Child Relationship | |
February 12, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice of Order in Suit to Modify Parent-Child Relatinship Mailed Out | |
December 22, 2014 | Docket Event | Waiver of Service | |
November 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
Service Request Information Sheet No Service Requested |
|
November 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
Motion to Modify-Other (OCA) Petition to Modify Parent-Child Relationship |
|
November 18, 2014 | Docket Event | BVS Acceptance Form | |
November 18, 2014 | Docket Event | Family Case Information Sheet | |
May 13, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice Judgment Notice |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.