Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Testing Laboratory, Inc., Rock Engineering, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Sixta, John A, Jr., against Pbk Architects, Inc., represented by Collins, Todd C, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Galvan, Bobby presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2011 |
CategoryConsumer/Commercial/Debt |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 25, 2014 | Docket Event | Returned Mail | |
July 30, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution Imaged |
|
July 30, 2014 | Docket Event | Dismissal Docket | |
June 30, 2014 | Docket Event | Returned Mail | |
May 24, 2013 | Docket Event |
Deposition Reporter's Certification Deposition of Trey Schneider April 8, 2013 |
|
March 26, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order Imaged |
|
February 26, 2013 | Docket Event | Original Answer Of Defendant PBK Architects, Inc | |
February 12, 2013 | Docket Event |
Deposition Subpoena Issued; PBK Architects Inc Served 02-13 by Michael J Barriethe |
|
January 28, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing Imaged |
|
January 22, 2013 | Docket Event | Citation Not Prepared by DC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.