Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Smith, Cheryl, filed a(n) Other Parent-Child - Family case against Patterson, Cory Amanda, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Galvan, Bobby presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2011 |
CategoryParent/Child Relationship |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeOther Parent-Child |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
Z - Certificate of Termination of Assignment (AG) Notice of Termination of Assignment and Child Support Services |
|
July 01, 2016 | Docket Event |
Z - Certificate of Termination of Assignment (AG) Notice of Termination of Assignment and Child Support Services |
|
June 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
Z - Certificate of Termination of Assignment (AG) Certificate of Termination of Assignment of Child Support Lien |
|
February 05, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order in Suit Affecting The Parent Child Relationship Imaged |
|
August 30, 2012 | Docket Event | Final Hearing | |
August 16, 2012 | Docket Event | Final Hearing | |
June 12, 2012 | Docket Event |
Original Answer Amicus Attorney's Original Answer In Suit Affecting The Parent-Child Relationship |
|
May 16, 2012 | Docket Event | Docket Control Conference | |
May 04, 2012 | Docket Event |
Order Appointing Amicus Atty (B Medina) Imaged |
|
May 03, 2012 | Docket Event | Motion for Appointment of Amicus Attorney/walked up by attorney |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.