Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Fletcher, Jessica Rene', filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Fletcher, Ethan Davis, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Hasette, Nanette presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 21, 2011 |
CategoryDivorce - Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 01, 2014 | Docket Event | Z - Notice of Change of Payee (AG) | |
February 28, 2012 | Docket Event | Final Hearing | |
January 04, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of setting for a final hearing: 02/28/12 at 1:30pm |
|
January 03, 2012 | Docket Event | Original Answer | |
December 28, 2011 | Docket Event | Citation | |
December 21, 2011 | Docket Event | Pro Se Notice | |
December 21, 2011 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Inability to Pay | |
December 21, 2011 | Docket Event | BVS Acceptance Form | |
December 21, 2011 | Docket Event | Family Case Information Sheet | |
December 21, 2011 | Docket Event | Service Request Information Sheet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.