Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Salinas, Luisa Victoria, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Gutierrez, Joe Alfred, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Williams, Guy presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 20, 2011 |
CategoryProtective Order |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
Order Protective Order/I |
|
February 29, 2012 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) PROTECTIVE ORDER |
|
February 22, 2012 | Docket Event |
Subpoena Issued; Officer R;. Ramirez #001252 Corpus Christi Police Department Unserved; No Dated by CP1 |
|
February 22, 2012 | Docket Event |
Subpoena Issued; Officers T. Taufaasau #8430 Corpus Chrsiti, Police Department Unserved; No Date by CP1 |
|
February 15, 2012 | Docket Event | Texas Crime Information Center | |
February 14, 2012 | Docket Event |
Order Extending Ex Parte Protective Order/Imaged |
|
February 14, 2012 | Docket Event |
Motion Agreed Motion to Extend Temporary Ex Parte Protective Order/Walked up by Esmer |
|
February 09, 2012 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) PROTECTIVE ORDER |
|
January 26, 2012 | Docket Event | Texas Crime Information Center | |
January 25, 2012 | Docket Event |
Motion Agreed Motion To Extend Temporary Ex Parte Protective Order **Walked To Court** |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.