Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Riddick, William, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case against Guerra, Michelle, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Stoner, Janice K. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2011 |
CategoryEviction |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 05, 2012 | Docket Event |
Judgment for the Plaintiff Hearing result for Eviction Hearing held on 01/05/2012 08:30 AM: Judgment for the Plaintiff ENTRY_DATETIME: 2012-01-05 10:18:36.0000000 ENTRY_USER: RG681421 LAST_DATETIME: 2012-01-05 10:18:36.0000000 LAST_USER: RG681421 |
|
January 05, 2012 | Docket Event |
Comment Judgment given to both parties in Court room ENTRY_DATETIME: 2012-01-05 10:20:00.0000000 ENTRY_USER: RG681421 LAST_DATETIME: 2012-01-05 10:20:00.0000000 LAST_USER: RG681421 |
|
January 05, 2012 | Docket Event | Judgment entered order date: 1/5/2012 Judgment type: Judgment for Plaintiff Disposition type: Judgment for Plaintiff Parties on judgment: Guerra, Michelle, Defendant; Riddick, William, Plaintiff(in favor) ENTRY_DATETIME: 2012-01-05 10:19:22.0000000 ENTRY_USER: RG681421 LAST_DATETIME: 2012-01-05 10:19:22.0000000 LAST_USER: RG681421 | |
January 05, 2012 | Docket Event | Eviction Hearing | |
December 29, 2011 | Docket Event |
Citation Issued Citation returned ENTRY_DATETIME: 2012-01-05 10:18:15.0000000 ENTRY_USER: RG681421 LAST_DATETIME: 2012-01-05 10:18:15.0000000 LAST_USER: RG681421 |
|
December 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
Service Served / December 28, 2011 ENTRY_DATETIME: 2012-01-05 10:17:56.0000000 ENTRY_USER: RG681421 LAST_DATETIME: 2012-01-05 10:17:56.0000000 LAST_USER: RG681421 |
|
December 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
Service Served to: Michelle Guerra ENTRY_DATETIME: 2011-12-29 10:57:55.0000000 ENTRY_USER: RG681421 LAST_DATETIME: 2011-12-29 10:57:55.0000000 LAST_USER: RG681421 |
|
December 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv Filing: Eviction Filing Fee and Service Fee Constable 2 Paid by: Riddick, William (plaintiff) Receipt number: 0027159 Dated: 12/28/2011 Amount: $106.00 (Check) ENTRY_DATETIME: 2011-12-28 14:17:49.0000000 ENTRY_USER: PC2624 LAST_DATETIME: 2011-12-28 14:17:49.0000000 LAST_USER: PC2624 |
|
December 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
Issued Citation: Issued Michelle Guerra Assigned to Constable Service fee of $75.00 on 12/28/2011 Served to: Michelle Guerra ENTRY_DATETIME: 2011-12-29 10:58:05.0000000 ENTRY_USER: RG681421 LAST_DATETIME: 2011-12-29 10:58:05.0000000 LAST_USER: RG681421 |
|
December 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
Case Filed (OCA OPEN) Case filed ENTRY_DATETIME: 2011-12-28 14:14:38.0000000 ENTRY_USER: PC2624 LAST_DATETIME: 2011-12-28 14:14:38.0000000 LAST_USER: PC2624 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.