Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Dubberke, Edward, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case against Rodriguez, Kimberly, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Stoner, Janice K. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2011 |
CategoryEviction |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 05, 2012 | Docket Event |
Comment Judgment was given to both parties ENTRY_DATETIME: 2012-01-05 10:09:56.0000000 ENTRY_USER: RG681421 LAST_DATETIME: 2012-01-05 10:09:56.0000000 LAST_USER: RG681421 |
|
January 05, 2012 | Docket Event | Judgment entered order date: 1/5/2012 Judgment type: Judgment for Plaintiff Disposition type: Judgment for Plaintiff Parties on judgment: Rodriguez, Kimberly, Defendant; Dubberke, Edward, Plaintiff(in favor) ENTRY_DATETIME: 2012-01-05 10:09:27.0000000 ENTRY_USER: RG681421 LAST_DATETIME: 2012-01-05 10:09:27.0000000 LAST_USER: RG681421 | |
January 05, 2012 | Docket Event | Eviction Hearing | |
January 05, 2012 | Docket Event |
Judgment for the Plaintiff Hearing result for Eviction Hearing held on 01/05/2012 08:30 AM: Judgment for the Plaintiff ENTRY_DATETIME: 2012-01-05 10:08:52.0000000 ENTRY_USER: RG681421 LAST_DATETIME: 2012-01-05 10:08:52.0000000 LAST_USER: RG681421 |
|
December 29, 2011 | Docket Event |
Citation Issued Citation returned ENTRY_DATETIME: 2012-01-05 10:08:30.0000000 ENTRY_USER: RG681421 LAST_DATETIME: 2012-01-05 10:08:30.0000000 LAST_USER: RG681421 |
|
December 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
Service Citation: Served Kimberly Rodriguez Assigned to Constable Service fee $75.00 Served 12/28/2011 / Rule 742A ENTRY_DATETIME: 2011-12-29 09:48:57.0000000 ENTRY_USER: RG681421 LAST_DATETIME: 2011-12-29 09:48:57.0000000 LAST_USER: RG681421 |
|
December 27, 2011 | Docket Event | Hearing Scheduled (Eviction Hearing 01/05/2012 08:30 AM) ENTRY_DATETIME: 2011-12-27 15:39:01.0000000 ENTRY_USER: RG681421 LAST_DATETIME: 2011-12-27 15:39:01.0000000 LAST_USER: RG681421 | |
December 27, 2011 | Docket Event |
Case Filed (OCA OPEN) Case filed ENTRY_DATETIME: 2011-12-27 15:34:37.0000000 ENTRY_USER: RG681421 LAST_DATETIME: 2011-12-27 15:34:37.0000000 LAST_USER: RG681421 |
|
December 27, 2011 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv Filing: Eviction Filing Fee and Service Fee Constable 2 Paid by: Dubberke, Edward (plaintiff) Receipt number: 0027145 Dated: 12/27/2011 Amount: $106.00 (Check) ENTRY_DATETIME: 2011-12-27 15:40:16.0000000 ENTRY_USER: RG681421 LAST_DATETIME: 2011-12-27 15:40:16.0000000 LAST_USER: RG681421 |
|
December 27, 2011 | Docket Event |
Service Rule 742A ENTRY_DATETIME: 2011-12-28 12:58:31.0000000 ENTRY_USER: RG681421 LAST_DATETIME: 2011-12-29 09:48:48.0000000 LAST_USER: RG681421 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.