Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Spanish Oaks, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case against Bray, Chester, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Torres, Amanda N. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2011 |
CategoryEviction |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 06, 2012 | Docket Event | Judgment entered order date: 1/6/2012 Judgment type: Judgment for Plaintiff Disposition type: Judgment for Plaintiff Parties on judgment: Bray, Chester, Defendant; Spanish Oaks, Plaintiff(in favor) ENTRY_DATETIME: 2012-01-06 09:26:04.0000000 ENTRY_USER: DR9360 LAST_DATETIME: 2012-01-06 09:26:04.0000000 LAST_USER: DR9360 | |
January 06, 2012 | Docket Event | Eviction Hearing | |
January 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
Comment Hearing result for Eviction Hearing held on 01/06/2012 09:00 AM: Trial By Judge ENTRY_DATETIME: 2012-01-06 09:25:26.0000000 ENTRY_USER: DR9360 LAST_DATETIME: 2012-01-06 09:25:26.0000000 LAST_USER: DR9360 |
|
December 29, 2011 | Docket Event |
Service Citation: Served Chester Bray Assigned to Constable Service fee $75.00 Served 12/29/2011 ENTRY_DATETIME: 2012-01-06 09:26:43.0000000 ENTRY_USER: DR9360 LAST_DATETIME: 2012-01-06 09:26:43.0000000 LAST_USER: DR9360 |
|
December 28, 2011 | Docket Event | Hearing Scheduled (Eviction Hearing 01/06/2012 09:00 AM) ENTRY_DATETIME: 2011-12-28 10:54:44.0000000 ENTRY_USER: LH685811 LAST_DATETIME: 2011-12-28 10:54:44.0000000 LAST_USER: LH685811 | |
December 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
Issued Citation: Issued Chester Bray Assigned to Constable Service fee of $75.00 (paid) on 12/28/2011 To be delivered by Constable 1 ENTRY_DATETIME: 2011-12-28 11:06:05.0000000 ENTRY_USER: LH685811 LAST_DATETIME: 2011-12-28 11:06:26.0000000 LAST_USER: LH685811 |
|
December 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
Service To be delivered by Constable 1 ENTRY_DATETIME: 2011-12-28 11:05:59.0000000 ENTRY_USER: LH685811 LAST_DATETIME: 2012-01-06 09:26:42.0000000 LAST_USER: DR9360 |
|
December 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv Filing: Eviction Filing Fee and Service Fee Constable 1 Paid by: Spanish Oaks (plaintiff) Receipt number: 0032784 Dated: 12/28/2011 Amount: $106.00 (Check) ENTRY_DATETIME: 2011-12-28 11:03:01.0000000 ENTRY_USER: LH685811 LAST_DATETIME: 2011-12-28 11:03:01.0000000 LAST_USER: LH685811 |
|
December 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
Case Filed (OCA OPEN) Case filed ENTRY_DATETIME: 2011-12-28 10:49:11.0000000 ENTRY_USER: LH685811 LAST_DATETIME: 2011-12-28 10:49:11.0000000 LAST_USER: LH685811 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.