Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Clayton, Kristal, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Hence, Michael, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Saldana, Marisela presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 17, 2010 |
CategoryDivorce - No Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 11, 2016 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Affidavit of Service for Michael Hence |
|
January 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order Nunc Pro Tunc - Final Decree of Divorce (Signed) |
|
January 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) MOTION FOR NUNC PRO TUNC |
|
December 21, 2015 | Docket Event | Citation | |
December 21, 2015 | Docket Event | Precept | |
December 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice Second Amended Notice of Hearing |
|
December 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) M4 NUNC PRO TUNC |
|
December 16, 2015 | Docket Event | Motion for Judgment Nunc Pro Tunc | |
December 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
Service Request Information Sheet Service Requested |
|
November 19, 2015 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) MOTION FOR NUNC PRO TUNC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.