Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Moreno, Veronica, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Moreno, Joe Robert, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Saldana, Marisela presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 14, 2010 |
CategoryDivorce - Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
Z - Certificate of Termination of Assignment (AG) Notice of Termination of Assignment and Child Support Services |
|
December 07, 2011 | Docket Event |
Employer's Order of Withholding - Request 12/14/2011 Mailed Final Decree signed 12/8/2010 to South Texas Monitoring Systems |
|
May 20, 2011 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail EOW to Homecare Dimensions delivered on 5/19/2010 signed by Odie Vasquez |
|
May 16, 2011 | Docket Event |
Employer's Order of Withholding - Request 5/18/2011 Mailed Request for Issuance of Order/Notice with certified copy of Final Decree of Divorce signed 12/8/2010 to Home Care Dimensions |
|
December 08, 2010 | Docket Event |
Letter To Court Manager |
|
December 08, 2010 | Docket Event |
Order Final Decree of Divorce-granted |
|
October 14, 2010 | Docket Event |
Final Hearing FINAL HRG. (30 MIN) |
|
October 07, 2010 | Docket Event | Motion for Temporary Orders, walked to court by Atty/DB | |
October 01, 2010 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) (30 MIN) |
|
September 22, 2010 | Docket Event | Citation |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.