Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Corpus Christi Housing Authority, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case against Morin, Vickie, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Gonzalez, Joe A. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 30, 2008 |
CategoryEviction |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 18, 2008 | Docket Event |
Comment Hearing result for Eviction Hearing held on 07/07/2008 09:00 AM: Trial By Judge ENTRY_DATETIME: 2008-07-18 10:06:33.0000000 ENTRY_USER: DR9360 LAST_DATETIME: 2008-07-18 10:06:33.0000000 LAST_USER: DR9360 |
|
July 07, 2008 | Docket Event | Judgment entered order date: 7/7/2008 Judgment type: Judgment for Plaintiff Disposition type: Judgment for Plaintiff Parties on judgment: Morin, Vickie, Defendant; Corpus Christi Housing Authority, Plaintiff(in favor) ENTRY_DATETIME: 2008-07-18 10:07:10.0000000 ENTRY_USER: DR9360 LAST_DATETIME: 2008-07-18 10:07:10.0000000 LAST_USER: DR9360 | |
July 07, 2008 | Docket Event | Eviction Hearing | |
June 30, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Filed (OCA OPEN) Case filed ENTRY_DATETIME: 2008-06-30 10:15:55.0000000 ENTRY_USER: LL9365 LAST_DATETIME: 2008-06-30 10:15:55.0000000 LAST_USER: LL9365 |
|
June 30, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv Filing: Eviction Filing Fee and Service Fee Constable 1 Paid by: Corpus Christi Housing Authority (plaintiff) Receipt number: 0017115 Dated: 6/30/2008 Amount: $97.00 (Check) ENTRY_DATETIME: 2008-06-30 10:22:56.0000000 ENTRY_USER: DR9360 LAST_DATETIME: 2008-06-30 10:22:56.0000000 LAST_USER: DR9360 |
|
June 30, 2008 | Docket Event |
Service ENTRY_DATETIME: 2008-07-18 10:06:21.0000000 ENTRY_USER: DR9360 LAST_DATETIME: 2008-07-18 10:06:21.0000000 LAST_USER: DR9360 |
|
June 30, 2008 | Docket Event |
Issued Citation: Issued Vickie Morin Assigned to Constable Service fee of $0.00 on 6/30/2008 ENTRY_DATETIME: 2008-07-18 10:06:22.0000000 ENTRY_USER: DR9360 LAST_DATETIME: 2008-07-18 10:06:22.0000000 LAST_USER: DR9360 |
|
June 30, 2008 | Docket Event | Hearing Scheduled (Eviction Hearing 07/07/2008 09:00 AM) ENTRY_DATETIME: 2008-06-30 10:19:53.0000000 ENTRY_USER: LL9365 LAST_DATETIME: 2008-06-30 10:19:53.0000000 LAST_USER: LL9365 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.