Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
State Of Texas, filed a(n) Property Hearing case against 1995 Ford Explorer Vin 1Fmdu34Xxszb11440, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Stoner, Janice K. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 27, 2008 |
CategoryProperty Hearing |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 25, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv Ms Proctor did not pick up title - took out of safe and placed in file if she come to pick it up. ENTRY_DATETIME: 2008-07-25 10:37:06.0000000 ENTRY_USER: EH3966 LAST_DATETIME: 2008-07-25 10:37:06.0000000 LAST_USER: EH3966 |
|
June 25, 2008 | Docket Event |
Telephone Call Called Ms Proctor - received title to vehicle from USAA (Fed EX) she will pick up ENTRY_DATETIME: 2008-07-25 10:37:06.0000000 ENTRY_USER: EH3966 LAST_DATETIME: 2008-07-25 10:37:06.0000000 LAST_USER: EH3966 |
|
April 15, 2008 | Docket Event | Property Hearing | |
April 15, 2008 | Docket Event |
Court Order Hearing result for Property Disposition held on 04/15/2008 09:30 AM: Court Order granting possession of property to Susan D Proctor ENTRY_DATETIME: 2008-04-16 15:45:21.0000000 ENTRY_USER: EH3966 LAST_DATETIME: 2008-04-16 15:45:21.0000000 LAST_USER: EH3966 |
|
April 10, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv Cert Mail sent to Michael Saldana ret UTL ENTRY_DATETIME: 2008-04-10 15:40:38.0000000 ENTRY_USER: LD6788521 LAST_DATETIME: 2008-04-10 15:40:38.0000000 LAST_USER: LD6788521 |
|
April 07, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice Hearing result for Property Disposition held on 04/07/2008 10:00 AM: To be Reset within 8 days per Judge ENTRY_DATETIME: 2008-04-07 11:03:06.0000000 ENTRY_USER: LD6788521 LAST_DATETIME: 2008-04-07 11:03:52.0000000 LAST_USER: LD6788521 |
|
April 07, 2008 | Docket Event | Hearing Scheduled (Property Disposition 04/15/2008 09:30 AM) ENTRY_DATETIME: 2008-04-07 11:04:25.0000000 ENTRY_USER: LD6788521 LAST_DATETIME: 2008-04-07 11:04:25.0000000 LAST_USER: LD6788521 | |
April 07, 2008 | Docket Event | Property Hearing | |
April 07, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv New hearing notices mailed to all concerned ENTRY_DATETIME: 2008-04-07 11:04:47.0000000 ENTRY_USER: LD6788521 LAST_DATETIME: 2008-04-07 11:04:47.0000000 LAST_USER: LD6788521 |
|
April 02, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv Cert. Mail ret. UTL for "Michael Saldana" ENTRY_DATETIME: 2008-04-02 11:25:23.0000000 ENTRY_USER: LD6788521 LAST_DATETIME: 2008-04-02 11:25:23.0000000 LAST_USER: LD6788521 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.