Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Lvnv Funding, Llc Assignee Of Sears, filed a(n) Other Civil Suits case represented by Espinosa, Claudine V., against Dora L Nugent Aka Dora Casti, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Gonzalez, Joe A. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 29, 2007 |
CategoryOther Civil Suits |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 15, 2009 | Docket Event | Abstract of Judgment issued and signed by judge on 05/15/2009 jv ENTRY_DATETIME: 2009-05-15 13:48:52.0000000 ENTRY_USER: JV8928 LAST_DATETIME: 2009-05-15 13:48:52.0000000 LAST_USER: JV8928 | |
September 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
Default Judgment Hearing result for Justice Civil Hearing held on 08/06/2008 10:00 AM: Default Judgment ENTRY_DATETIME: 2008-09-24 15:37:28.0000000 ENTRY_USER: LL9365 LAST_DATETIME: 2008-09-24 15:37:28.0000000 LAST_USER: LL9365 |
|
September 09, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv Filing: Abstract of Judgment Paid by: Mann Bracken LLC Receipt number: 0017955 Dated: 9/9/2008 Amount: $5.00 (Check) ENTRY_DATETIME: 2008-09-09 08:26:12.0000000 ENTRY_USER: DA6341 LAST_DATETIME: 2008-09-09 08:26:12.0000000 LAST_USER: DA6341 |
|
August 06, 2008 | Docket Event | Justice Civil Hearing | |
July 10, 2008 | Docket Event | Hearing Scheduled (Justice Civil Hearing 08/06/2008 10:00 AM) ENTRY_DATETIME: 2008-07-10 10:39:45.0000000 ENTRY_USER: LL9365 LAST_DATETIME: 2008-07-10 10:39:45.0000000 LAST_USER: LL9365 | |
January 29, 2008 | Docket Event |
Answer - Original Answer filed Defendant's Original Answer filed ENTRY_DATETIME: 2008-02-07 15:03:59.0000000 ENTRY_USER: DA6341 LAST_DATETIME: 2008-02-07 15:03:59.0000000 LAST_USER: DA6341 |
|
January 23, 2008 | Docket Event |
Service Citation: Served Dora L Nugent Assigned to OTA, Officer Service fee $0.00 Served 1/23/2008 ENTRY_DATETIME: 2008-02-07 15:05:34.0000000 ENTRY_USER: DA6341 LAST_DATETIME: 2008-02-07 15:05:34.0000000 LAST_USER: DA6341 |
|
January 04, 2008 | Docket Event |
Service citation issued 1/4/08 to Prof Civil Process ENTRY_DATETIME: 2008-01-04 16:28:58.0000000 ENTRY_USER: DA6341 LAST_DATETIME: 2008-02-07 15:05:33.0000000 LAST_USER: DA6341 |
|
January 04, 2008 | Docket Event |
Issued Citation: Issued Dora L Nugent Assigned to OTA, Officer Service fee of $0.00 on 1/4/2008 citation issued 1/4/08 to Prof Civil Process ENTRY_DATETIME: 2008-01-04 16:28:59.0000000 ENTRY_USER: DA6341 LAST_DATETIME: 2008-01-04 16:28:59.0000000 LAST_USER: DA6341 |
|
November 19, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv Filing: JP Filing Civil Suit Paid by: Wolfpoff & ABramson Receipt number: 0013518 Dated: 11/19/2007 Amount: $17.00 (Check) ENTRY_DATETIME: 2007-11-19 15:50:14.0000000 ENTRY_USER: DA6341 LAST_DATETIME: 2007-11-19 15:50:14.0000000 LAST_USER: DA6341 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.