Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Palisades Collection Llc Assignee Of Hsbc, filed a(n) Other Civil Suits case represented by Espinosa, Claudine V., against Reta, Jesus E, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Gonzalez, Joe A. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 29, 2007 |
CategoryOther Civil Suits |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
Comment Hearing result for Hearing held on 11/17/2008 01:30 PM: Trial By Judge DROP DOCKET ENTRY_DATETIME: 2008-11-24 15:06:11.0000000 ENTRY_USER: LL9365 LAST_DATETIME: 2008-11-24 15:06:11.0000000 LAST_USER: LL9365 |
|
November 17, 2008 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) TYPE_COMMENT: DROP DOCKET |
|
October 08, 2008 | Docket Event | Hearing Scheduled (Hearing 11/20/2008 02:00 PM) DROP DOCKET ENTRY_DATETIME: 2008-10-08 16:11:40.0000000 ENTRY_USER: DA6341 LAST_DATETIME: 2008-10-08 16:11:40.0000000 LAST_USER: DA6341 | |
July 29, 2008 | Docket Event | Judgment entered order date: 7/29/2008 Judgment type: Default Judgment Disposition type: Default Judgment Parties on judgment: Reta, Jesus E, Defendant; Palisades Collection, LLC Assignee Of HSBC, Plaintiff(in favor) ENTRY_DATETIME: 2008-08-20 13:55:06.0000000 ENTRY_USER: DA6341 LAST_DATETIME: 2008-08-20 13:55:06.0000000 LAST_USER: DA6341 | |
January 02, 2008 | Docket Event |
Issued Citation: Issued Jesus E Reta Assigned to OTA, Officer Service fee of $0.00 on 1/2/2008 citation issued 1/4/08 to Prof Civil Process ENTRY_DATETIME: 2008-01-04 16:21:03.0000000 ENTRY_USER: DA6341 LAST_DATETIME: 2008-01-04 16:21:03.0000000 LAST_USER: DA6341 |
|
November 19, 2007 | Docket Event |
Letter of representation from attorney Plaintiff: Palisades Collection, L.L.C. ASSIGNEE OF HSBC, Letter of representation from attorney Claudine V. Espinosa ENTRY_DATETIME: 2007-11-19 15:05:18.0000000 ENTRY_USER: DA6341 LAST_DATETIME: 2007-11-19 15:05:18.0000000 LAST_USER: DA6341 |
|
November 19, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv Filing: JP Filing Civil Suit Paid by: Wolpoff & Abramson, LLP Receipt number: 0013505 Dated: 11/19/2007 Amount: $17.00 (Check) ENTRY_DATETIME: 2007-11-19 15:06:35.0000000 ENTRY_USER: DA6341 LAST_DATETIME: 2007-11-19 15:06:35.0000000 LAST_USER: DA6341 |
|
October 29, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Filed (OCA OPEN) Case filed ENTRY_DATETIME: 2007-11-19 15:04:43.0000000 ENTRY_USER: DA6341 LAST_DATETIME: 2007-11-19 15:04:43.0000000 LAST_USER: DA6341 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.